Experienced financial professional with a proven track record in providing comprehensive assistance and strategic advisory for credit facilities with Banks and NBFCs. Specialized expertise in SME and Agriculture credits, adept in bad debts recovery, proficient in financial management, and well-versed in tax planning and GST-related matters. Accomplished in navigating the complexities of the stock market, Mutual Funds, and various wealth creation tools. Recognized for delivering tailored solutions to High Net Worth Individuals (HNIs) and skilled in organizing impactful seminars. Committed to optimizing financial portfolios and fostering sustainable wealth growth through informed decision-making.
๐๐๐ฌ ๐ฆ๐๐๐๐๐ฆ
โ Financial Advisory
โ Market Expansion
โ Audit and Compliance Management
โ SME and Agriculture Credit
โ Reporting and MIS Delivery
โ GST Reconciliation
โ Manufacturing Finance
โ Sales and Marketing
โ Branch Development
โ Depository and Demat Services
โ Government Liaison
โ Manufacturing Operations
โ Project Management
โ Financial Analysis
โ Bad Debts Recovery
โ SARFAESI Case Management
โ
โ
โ
Independently Working With A Group of Ex-Bankers/Professionals
August 2020 - Present
Duties and Responsibilities : โ Advising on credit facilities with Banks and NBFCs, focusing on SME and Agriculture.
โ Actively implementing strategies for bad debt recovery.
โ Providing ongoing guidance in financial management and tax planning.
โ Offering real-time insights on stock market trends, Mutual Funds, and investments.
โ Organizing seminars and awareness camps in Raipur on various financial matters.
โ Facilitating discussions and workshops on wealth creation tools for High Net Worth Individuals (HNIs).
AAA Insolvency Professional LLP, New Delhi
18th December 2017 - 31st January 2020
Duties and Responsibilities : โ Managed SARFAESI cases in Chhattisgarh for various bank branches since July 12, 2019.
โ Involved in Corporate Insolvency Resolution Process (CIRP) for companies like "M/s Rasoya Proteins Ltd.," "M/s Charbhuja Industries," "M/s Visa Steel and Power Ltd.," and "M/s Vandana Vidhyut Ltd." from December 18, 2017, to July 10, 2019.
โ Supervised CIRP matters, resolving issues with banks, insurance companies, SEBI, stock exchanges, DRT, tax authorities, state electricity board, vendors, suppliers, stakeholders, and legal proceedings.
โ Handled team management across four manufacturing units, corporate office, and regional marketing office.
Axis Bank Ltd.
October 2002 - 18th September 2017
Duties and Responsibilities : GROWTH PATH
๐๐ฟ๐ฎ๐ป๐ฐ๐ต ๐๐ฒ๐ฎ๐ฑ, ๐๐ต๐๐ฟ๐ฎ๐ถ (11th August 2014 - 18th September 2017)
๐๐ฟ๐ฎ๐ป๐ฐ๐ต ๐๐ฒ๐ฎ๐ฑ, ๐๐ต๐ฎ๐๐ฎ๐ฝ๐ฎ๐ฟ๐ฎ (18th August 2010 - 10th August 2014)
๐ข๐ฝ๐ฒ๐ฟ๐ฎ๐๐ถ๐ผ๐ป๐ ๐๐ฒ๐ฎ๐ฑ, ๐ฅ๐ฎ๐ถ๐ด๐ฎ๐ฟ๐ต (28th February 2007 - 17th August 2010)
๐๐ฟ๐ผ๐ป๐ ๐๐ฒ๐๐ธ ๐ข๐ณ๐ณ๐ถ๐ฐ๐ฒ๐ฟ, ๐ฅ๐ฎ๐ถ๐ฝ๐๐ฟ (26th October 2002 - 27th February 2007)
๐๐ฟ๐ผ๐ป๐ ๐๐ฒ๐๐ธ ๐ข๐ณ๐ณ๐ถ๐ฐ๐ฒ๐ฟ - ๐ข๐ฝ๐ฒ๐ฟ๐ฎ๐๐ถ๐ผ๐ป๐ (April 2006 - February 2007)
๐๐ฟ๐ฎ๐ป๐ฐ๐ต ๐ฆ๐ฎ๐น๐ฒ๐ ๐ ๐ฎ๐ป๐ฎ๐ด๐ฒ๐ฟ (April 2005 - March 2006)
๐ข๐ฝ๐ฒ๐ฟ๐ฎ๐๐ถ๐ผ๐ป๐ (October 2002 - March 2005)
โ Led a dynamic team of operations and marketing professionals, driving profitability and ensuring exceptional customer service in a compliant environment (Team size: 20+).
โ Oversaw Retail Branch banking, Govt. Business, Team Leadership, and Audit and Compliance.
โ Directed the branch in both liability and assets, ensuring the delivery of convenient banking and financial products in a technology-driven environment.
โ Drove sustainable market share growth, brand positioning, and profitability in retail and business banking within the assigned geography.
โ Spearheaded the successful establishment and rapid growth of Agriculture Credit business at the Bhatapara Branch, specializing in diverse products for agri-food processing industries and large-scale farming activities.
โ Drove new business initiatives, expanded the customer base, and enhanced product and service offerings.
โ Maintained high customer service levels, ensuring customer satisfaction, retention, and business growth.
โ Implemented ethical business practices, compliance systems, and procedures, fostering customer delight.
โ Took charge of audit and compliance-related activities at the branch, ensuring active participation and involvement.
โ Achieved targets for branch profitability, CASA, CDAB/MDAB/MEB volume, IPG growth, and advances in Agri-Credit and other financial products.
โ Provided continuous training, coaching, and motivation to branch resources for efficient and compliant operations.
โ Facilitated knowledge and skill development to ensure a high level of productivity.
โ Ensured timely and accurate delivery of various MIS, Control Returns, and reports to higher authorities and regulatory bodies.
โ Built and strengthened relationships with HNI clients, corporate houses, government offices, and various stakeholders to explore mutually beneficial commercial relationships.
โ Liaised with authorities at different levels, including District Collectors, Bank Branches, and Government Committees, to establish a strong foothold for the bank.
Stock Holding Corporation of India Ltd. (SHCIL), Raipur
01st November 1999 - 25th October 2002
Duties and Responsibilities : โ Founded the first branch of the company (SHCIL) in the commercial capital of Chhattisgarh, promoting the concept of Depository Participant, Demat accounts, and dematerialization of physical share certificates in Chhattisgarh and western Orissa.
โ Managed back-office tasks such as processing delivery instructions, dematerialization requests, and share certificates, establishing the office as a one-stop solution for stock market-related issues.
โ Expanded services, including online trading for Demat account holders and selling third-party products like RBI bonds, Tax-free Infrastructure Bonds, Company Deposits, and Mutual Funds.
โ Opened and stabilized offices in Bhilai, Bilaspur, Raigarh, treating them as separate Strategic Business Units (SBUs) and ensuring profitability.
โ Conducted seminars for brokers, sub-brokers, and stock market enthusiasts, sharing insights on stock market terminology, depository systems, settlement processes, investment tools, and tax-saving instruments.
โ After approximately 3 years, the Raipur office had over 12,000 Demat accounts, a robust franchise network, and an operating profit close to Rs. 1 Crore before departure.
Vibgyor Masterbatches (P) Ltd., Raipur
16th February 1998 - 06th November 1999
Duties and Responsibilities : โ Managed Finance and Accounting functions for a small plastic master-batch manufacturing plant.
โ Handled submissions and reporting at various government offices and institutions.
โ Managed procurement processes, including competitive bidding, orders, payments, and TDS certificate submissions.
โ Successfully implemented cost-cutting measures without compromising quality and production volume of the plant.
Reckitt & Colman of India Ltd., Kolhapur
21st April 1997 - 31st January 1998
Duties and Responsibilities : โ Achieved monthly sales budgets and expanded distributor channels in South Maharashtra as a Sales Representative.
โ Managed a larger market territory covering Kolhapur, Ratnagiri, and Sindhudurg districts.
โ Overachieved sales budgets, ranking first among 11 SRs in the Pune Zone.
โ Recognized with a Certificate of Excellence at the National Sales Conference in Hyderabad.
Tata Iron and Steel Company (TISCO) Ltd., Balodabazar
May 1995 to June 1995 - November 1995 to February 1996
Duties and Responsibilities : โ Conducted a market survey (Summer Training Project) on "Advertising and Sales Promotions activities in the Cement market of Chhattisgarh region," providing valuable insights for the launch of "Tata Steel Cement."
โ Submitted a detailed project report aiding the company in formulating an effective marketing plan.
โ Underwent on-the-job training in the marketing department for four months, gaining practical knowledge in sales and marketing functions, dealer/distributor network management, relationship building, planning, follow-ups, and product promotion.
__________________________________________________________________________________________________________________
๐๐๐ฅ๐ง๐๐๐๐๐๐ง๐๐ข๐ก๐ฆ
โ Successfully completed and passed an examination on "Anti-Money Laundering and Know Your Customer" in 2010, conducted by the Indian Institute of Banking & Finance (IIBF).
โ Attained certification in "SME Finance for Bankers" in 2010, passing the examination conducted by the Indian Institute of Banking & Finance (IIBF).
โ Achieved clearance in the Mutual Funds โ Distributor Module from NISM/AMFI in 2016.
โ Cleared the NCFM- Depository Participants Module in 2015.
Pt. Ravi Shankar Shukla University, Raipur, 1996 - Completed
Pt. Ravi Shankar Shukla University, Raipur, 1994 - Completed
The above mentioned details are true to the best of my knowledge and given a chance, I shall discharge my duties to the entire satisfaction of my superiors. Hope that credentials satisfy your requirement & looking forward for further contacts.